TOWERSEY PLAYING FIELDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The management of playing fields, including a children's play area within the village of Towersey
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 28 March 1996: Standard registration
- T P F M C (TOWERSEY PLAYING FIELD MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE) (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Duckham | Chair | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian David Gibbs | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER THERESA JONES | Trustee | 27 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Anthony Masters | Trustee | 27 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.31k | £23.71k | £28.07k | £35.60k | £44.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.96k | £7.43k | £5.12k | £14.56k | £17.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.60k | £18.70k | £10.71k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 17 July 2024 | 321 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 17 July 2024 | 321 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 09 October 2022 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 09 October 2022 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 18 May 2021 | 260 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 18 May 2021 | 260 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 1 JANUARY 1971
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF RECREATION AND SPORTS FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Three Horseshoes Cottage
Chinnor Road
Towersey
THAME
Oxfordshire
OX9 3QY
- Phone:
- 01844217108
- Email:
- jjjuly@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window