Accounts and annual returns CYLCH MEITHRIN TRELECH

Charity number: 1054136
Charity reporting is overdue by 1187 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 March 2024 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1187 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required