Accounts and annual returns THE DARTMOUTH COLLEGE TRUST

Charity Number: 1054144
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2022 21 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 28 April 2023 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2021 21 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 27 April 2022 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2020 24 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 26 April 2021 On Time