Financial history THE DARTMOUTH COLLEGE TRUST

Charity Number: 1054144
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £899.80k £471.02k £907.22k £778.36k £554.21k
Total expenditure £856.97k £462.70k £839.24k £840.22k £269.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £899.80k N/A £906.67k £777.55k £554.21k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 N/A £544 £814 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £856.97k N/A £839.24k £840.22k £269.30k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.66k N/A £6.67k £7.34k £8.66k
Expenditure - Grants institution £851.26k N/A £831.30k £832.71k £260.52k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0