Governing document COUNCIL OF VALIDATING UNIVERSITIES
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/02/1996 AS AMENDED ON 13/02/1997 AS AMENDED ON 10/09/1999 AS AMENDED ON 08/02/2000 AS AMENDED ON 23/02/2004 AS AMENDED ON 16/09/2004 AS AMENDED ON 17/09/2009
Charitable objects
1. THE OBJECTS OF THE COUNCIL ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, INCLUDING TRAINING AND RESEARCH, IN PARTICULAR BY: KEEPING UNDER REVIEW THE CONCERNS OF DEGREE-AWARDING INSTITUTIONS WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM IN RELATION TO COLLABORATIVE VALIDATION; IDENTIFYING AND PROMOTING GOOD PRACTICE IN COLLABORATIVE VALIDATION. 2. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THESE OBJECTS, COLLABORATIVE VALIDATION IS DEFINED AS THE PROCESS WHEREBY A DEGREE-AWARDING BODY JUDGES ONE OR MORE PROGRAMMES OF STUDY, MODULES OR COURSES OFFERED BY ANOTHER BODY (OR BODIES) TO BE APPROPRIATE TO LEAD TO A QUALIFICATION AND/OR CREDIT OF THAT DEGREE-AWARDING BODY. IT ACCORDINGLY ENCOMPASSES THE DELIVERY BY ANOTHER BODY (OR BODIES) OF PROGRAMMES, COURSES OR MODULES WHERE THE CONTENT (CURRICULUM/LEARNING OUTCOMES) HAS BEEN DESIGNED AND DEVELOPED BY EITHER THE DEGREE-AWARDING BODY OR THE OTHER BODY (OR BODIES) OR A PARTNERSHIP OF THE DEGREE-AWARDING BODY AND THE OTHER BODY (OR BODIES). 3. IN THE CONTEXT OF THIS CONSTITUTION, THE TERM COLLABORATIVE VALIDATION SHALL BE DEEMED TO EMBRACE THE ACCREDITING OF INSTITUTIONS, THE FRANCHISING OF COURSES AND SUCH OTHER FORMS OF ACADEMIC ASSOCIATION AS THE COUNCIL SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.