TRINITY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (TAUNTON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Trinity school association carries out a variety of activities throughout the school year including a summer and Christmas fair. They also take every opportunity to raise money via grants etc. This is all done locally for Holy Trinity C of E school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Somerset
Governance
- 29 March 1996: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah O'Connor | Chair | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bryony Jane Swinfen | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
SOPHIE MICHAELA COWDELL | Trustee | 01 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.51k | £1.27k | £5.82k | £6.91k | £5.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.37k | £2.17k | £2.67k | £6.56k | £3.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/11/1995 AS AMENDED ON 17/10/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF TRINITY CEVA PRIMARY SCHOOL TAUNTON BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE CATCHMENT AREA OF TRINITY SCHOOL, TAUNTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holy Trinity Primary School
Taunton
South Street Taunton
TA1 3AF
- Phone:
- 07981625241
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window