Accounts and annual returns GURU ARJAN DEV MISSION

Charity number: 1054207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 March 2024 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 March 2022 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required