Accounts and annual returns POLICE SUMMER CAMP PROJECT

Charity number: 1054219
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2014 01 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required