EXETER HISTORIC BUILDINGS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preservation of Buildings of Historical & Architectural interest in and around and for the benefit of the City of Exeter.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 02 April 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Scott | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clare Lorna Maudling | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Ann Ellison | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Victoria Sinclair | Trustee | 16 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Gordon Clark | Trustee | 21 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE CELIA ARRELL | Trustee | 23 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT PAUL CHANT | Trustee |
|
||||||
RICHARD WILLIAM PARKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £108.20k | £211.45k | £163.66k | £160.25k | £139.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.63k | £135.15k | £147.50k | £195.37k | £166.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £45.20k | £17.34k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/03/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/05/2013
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE TOWNSPEOPLE OR THE CITY OF EXETER, WHATEVER HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND THE CITY OF EXETER, IN THE FORM OF BUILDINGS (INCLUDING ANY BUILDING AS DEFINED IN SECTION 336(1) OF THE TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING ACT 1990), OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST.
Area of benefit
CITY OF EXETER IN THE COUNTY OF DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 THE MINT
EXETER
EX4 3BL
- Phone:
- 01392436000
- Email:
- enquiries@ehbt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window