Governing document FRIENDS OF BLACKMORE SCHOOL
Charity Number: 1054242

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 OCTOBER 1975 AS AMENDED 16 OCTOBER 1984, 28 SEPTEMBER 1995 AND 1 APRIL 2010 as amended on 25 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
BLACKMORE, ESSEX
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.