1ST ESSINGTON SCOUTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting activities for boys and girls aged 6 to 14
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 03 April 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Donna Willis | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Adam Blount | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Simon Vilks | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Dunn | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Steel | Trustee | 04 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
James Steel | Trustee | 08 November 2013 |
|
|||||
Susan Dunnicliff | Trustee | 22 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Benton | Trustee | 01 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Michael Booton | Trustee | 14 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Christine Porter | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.35k | £32.23k | £33.75k | £24.09k | £27.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.72k | £9.62k | £30.81k | £30.06k | £50.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.67k | £11.42k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED-IN PRACTICE ESSINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st Essington Scout & Guide HQ
Brownshore Lane
Essington
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV11 2AE
- Phone:
- 01922279898
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window