NOTTINGHAM NO.1 GROUP OF ADVANCED MOTORISTS
Charity Number: 1054277
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Coaching members of the public to take and pass the Advanced Driving Test
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Total income: £1,496
Total expenditure: £2,071
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
Registration history:
- 03 April 1996: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 November 2009: Standard registration
- 19 August 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.15k | £973 | £1.00k | £888 | £1.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £957 | £1.10k | £1.17k | £605 | £2.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 03 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 24 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 03 April 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 14 JULY 1995
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE STNADARD OF DRIVING AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF ROAD SAFETY
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window