TOCKWITH SCHOOL P.T.A.

Charity number: 1054285
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fundraising for school equipment, events, trips and visits and curriculum enrichment.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £4,874
Total expenditure: £7,123

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 April 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • TOCKWITH SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Claire Gould Trustee 01 March 2022
TOCKWITH UNDER FIVES FAMILY GROUP
Received: On time
Fiona Bulmer Trustee 01 January 2016
None on record
Justin Reeve Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £2.19k £2.08k £5.44k £7.46k £4.87k
Total expenditure £475 £1.31k £6.23k £4.67k £7.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 03 January 2025 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 29 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 29 November 2023 364 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 08 March 2022 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 30 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
TOCKWITH C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
SOUTHFIELD LANE
TOCKWITH
YORK
YO26 7RP
Phone:
01423358375
Website:

tockwith.ebor.academy