Financial history PNEUMA CHRISTIAN CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 1054299
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £65.63k £51.60k £84.89k £82.31k £96.24k
Total expenditure £47.03k £40.87k £44.77k £69.08k £69.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A