Financial history AYLESBURY WOMEN'S AID

Charity number: 1054308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £859.82k £933.40k £910.35k £973.18k £1.06m
Total expenditure £840.08k £837.40k £888.70k £968.27k £1.03m
Income from government contracts £638.62k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £651.74k £681.28k £664.85k £650.05k
Income - Donations and legacies £7.51k £791.62k £735.34k £770.28k £822.41k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £850.24k £140.89k £174.76k £201.22k £224.04k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.49k £156 £129 £1.42k £5.03k
Income - Other £584 £735 £117 £257 £7.50k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £840.08k £837.40k £888.70k £968.27k £1.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £70.03k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0