EMMANUEL PENTECOSTAL CHURCH BEDFORD

Charity number: 1054320
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Emmanuel Pentecostal Church provides religious activities, advice and information to the general public.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Bedford
  • Central Bedfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 April 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CHIESA CRISTIANA EVANGELICA ITALIANA (Working name)
  • EMMANUEL PENTECOSTAL ITALIAN CHURCH (Working name)
  • ITALIAN PENTECOSTAL CHURCH (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID IASIO Trustee 28 May 2017
None on record
ANTONIO TUFARO Trustee
None on record
MARIA SPIGA Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/03/2020 01/03/2021 01/03/2022 01/03/2023 01/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £3.02k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 March 2024 04 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 March 2023 02 February 2024 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 March 2022 29 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 March 2021 27 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2021 13 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 March 2020 29 March 2021 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 AYLESBURY ROAD
BEDFORD
MK41 9QZ
Phone:
01234327152
Website:

No information available