Financial history BETHEL CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1054348
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £102.63k £59.78k £99.36k £105.61k £102.77k
Total expenditure £97.42k £55.09k £84.09k £98.82k £113.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A