LEA VALLEY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
"We exist to build a community of believers who will impact Waltham Abbey, the Lea Valley Region, London, and the World beyond" ACTS 1:8 Lea Valley Church (L.V.C.) has been in Waltham Abbey, Essex since the end of WWII. We are a growing family church, which is motivated by love, inspired to victory and centred on Christ. We want to be relevant to our community and practical in our Christianity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 09 April 1996: Standard registration
- LVC (Working name)
- THE WORD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev GEOFF ACE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mark Jones | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev TIMOTHY GUTMANN | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN STUART LIDDLE | Trustee | 29 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Denise Fitch | Trustee | 07 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £217.86k | £210.80k | £189.39k | £205.16k | £185.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £211.94k | £192.63k | £155.15k | £198.84k | £190.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH NOVEMBER 1993, AS AMENDED 8 OCT 2009.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FORTHCOMING OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE WALTHAM ABBEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
LEA VALLEY CHURCH
MONKSWOOD AVENUE
WALTHAM ABBEY
EN9 1LB
- Phone:
- 01992712127
- Email:
- info@lvc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window