THE PENTECOSTAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. The advancement of the Christian religion by the proclamation of the Gospel of Jesus Christ the Lord and the teaching of the Word of God in accordance with the essential doctrines and articles of belief of Assemblies of God in Great Britain and Ireland as approved by the General Council. 2. The furtherance of other charitable work of the church consistent with the above doctrines and articles.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 09 April 1996: Standard registration
- HARVEST FAMILY SCHOOL (Working name)
- NEW LIFE BIBLE SCHOOL (Working name)
- NEW LIFE PENTECOSTAL CHURCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pastor Aaron Berko | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Joanna Iribagiza Addison | Trustee | 22 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Onuchukwu Dr | Trustee | 08 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shadreck Chikomba | Trustee | 14 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.13k | £123.06k | £74.21k | £90.20k | £105.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.81k | £76.42k | £81.37k | £90.69k | £126.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 September 2024 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 13 September 2024 | 75 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 July 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 01 July 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 September 2021 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 14 September 2021 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 14 July 2020 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 14 July 2020 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND TRUST DEED ADOPTED 10 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; (B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE CANTERBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Hub
Unit 16B-C
Roper Close
Canterbury
Kent
CT2 7EP
- Phone:
- 07885956528
- Email:
- office@newlifecanterbury.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window