THE QUEEN'S OWN GURKHA LOGISTIC REGIMENT REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Keep contact with former and serving members of the Regiment, foster mutual friendship/esprit de corps that provides support to the GBA , GWT and Gurkha Museum. Funds provide support for education in schools in Nepal and to branches there for anniversary functions and ad hoc payments to those in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
- Wiltshire
- Nepal
Governance
- 04 April 1996: Standard registration
- QOGLRRA (Working name)
- QUEEN'S OWN GURKHA TRANSPORT REGIMENT REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brigadier Patrick Simon Reehal MBE | Chair | 05 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Major Bhimbahadur Shreesh QOGLR | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lieutenant Colonel Oliver T Nyman RLC | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Captain Henry Eaton RLC | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Captain Uttam Limbu QOGLR | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
LIEUTENANT COLONEL LAURENCE EVANSON-GODDARD TD | Trustee | 20 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Major Palijar Tamang | Trustee | 20 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.00k | £17.47k | £15.63k | £11.63k | £13.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.91k | £9.79k | £17.69k | £73.08k | £11.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 25 OCT 1996 AS AMENDED ON 15 MAY 1998 AS AMENDED ON 11 MAY 2001 AS AMENDED ON 16 MAY 2008 AS AMENDED ON 16 OCT 2018 as amended on 14 Jan 2021 as amended on 06 May 2021
Charitable objects
A) THE AIM OF THE QOGLR RA IS TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF GURKHAS AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE QUEEN'S OWN GURKHA LOGISTIC REGIMENT (THE REGIMENT) BY: MAINTAINING CONTACT BETWEEN FORMER AND SERVING MEMBERS OF THE QOGLR AND ITS ANTECEDENT REGIMENTS (NAMELY THE GURKHA ARMY SERVICE CORPS, THE GURKHA TRANSPORT REGIMENT AND THE QUEEN'S OWN GURKHA TRANSPORT REGIMENT) FOSTERING MUTUAL FRIENDSHIP BETWEEN THEM AND PROVIDING SOCIAL GATHERINGS FOR THEM. B) FOSTERING ESPRIT DE CORPS, COMRADESHIP AND THE WELFARE OF THE REGIMENT AND PRESERVING ITS TRADITIONS AND THOSE OF ITS ANTECEDENT REGIMENTS. C) PROVIDING FOR FORMER AND SERVING MEMBERS OF THE REGIMENT AND ITS ANTECEDENT REGIMENTS TO PLAY A FULL PART IN THE CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES CARRIED OUT BY THE GURKHA BRIGADE ASSOCIATION (GBA) AND THE GURKHA WELFARE TRUST (GWT) IN THE RELIEF OF SERVING AND FORMER MEMBERS OF THE REGIMENT AND ITS ANTECEDENT REGIMENTS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS (BENEFICIARIES).
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND NEPAL
Linked charities
- 04 April 1996 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Middleton Gardens
FARNBOROUGH
Hampshire
GU14 9PH
- Phone:
- 07763395437
- Email:
- pali7317@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window