KWAAFRICA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing advocacy and lobbying support Delivering health and well-being services Improving their access to education and training for employment Fostering the development of sustainable businesses within those communities Supporting their integration into the wider community Building the capacity of those communities to improve their life chances
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Burundi
- Congo
- Kenya
- Rwanda
- South Africa
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- Zambia
Governance
- 04 April 1996: Standard registration
- AFRICARE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Cephas Mosinghi | Chair | 28 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Evelyn N Schiller | Trustee | 22 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
MAX LUBEGA | Trustee | 10 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.49k | £65.66k | £29.31k | £15.00k | £1.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.19k | £60.30k | £28.86k | £15.00k | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2025 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/04/1995 AS AMENDED ON 15/03/1996 AS AMENDED ON 09/09/2013
Charitable objects
(A) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST AFRICAN CHILDREN AND FAMILIES AFFECTED BY HIV/AIDS IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF CULTURALLY SENSITIVE SERVICES. (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN CHILDCARE AMONGST MEMBERS OF THE AFRICAN COMMUNITY IN ORDER TO ENCOURAGE AFRICANS TO BECOME CARERS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 44
Doddington & Rollo Community Associ
Charlotte Despard Avenue
LONDON
Greater London
SW11 5HD
- Phone:
- 02071832270
- Email:
- info@kwaafrica.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window