Accounts and annual returns EMMANUEL PENTECOSTAL CHURCH

Charity number: 1054370
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2009 18 September 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 18 September 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2008 27 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 27 August 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 10 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 10 September 2008 On Time