GATEWAY CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide spiritual and practical help for all. Provide a Sunday School Club for 11 to 17 year olds. Hold public services on Thursday, Saturday and Sunday.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 09 April 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EVALINE WANJIRU THOMAS | Trustee | 08 December 2023 |
|
|||||
MRS S KEMBLE-GORDON | Trustee | 18 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.69k | £12.49k | £16.20k | £19.80k | £12.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.47k | £10.50k | £14.06k | £19.00k | £12.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5TH MAY 1993 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22/02/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH SHALL BE: (I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST THE LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE WORD OF GOD BY THE CHURCH (II) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL FURTHER THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH OR ANY OF THEM (III) THE FURTHERANCE OF THE OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE DOVER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gateway Christian Fellowship
Tower Hamlets Road
DOVER
CT17 0BL
- Phone:
- 01304826626
- Email:
- gcf.church1996@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window