NEW LIFE FAMILY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main objective of the Fellowship is the proclamation and furtherance of the Gospel of God concerning His Son, Jesus Christ, the Lord through preaching and teaching the Word of God. The mission of the Fellowship is to establish and to extend the Kingdom of God in Thanet, England and the World. Activities to promote the objectives include missionary support, community outreach programs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 09 April 1996: Standard registration
- NEW LIFE FAMILY CHURCH (Working name)
- NEW LIFE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Norman Leslie Dart | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
RASHELLE ROESTORFF | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hermanus Nicolas Roestorff | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tim Todd | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Douglas Thomson | Trustee | 22 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
GAVIN ROY YOUNG | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £235.90k | £170.85k | £213.91k | £167.08k | £219.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £244.29k | £202.62k | £213.41k | £189.74k | £160.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MAR 1994 AS AMENDED ON 04 OCT 2010 AS AMENDED ON 28 APR 2017 AS AMENDED ON 25 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT (B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 CHURCH STREET
MARGATE
KENT
CT9 1ST
- Phone:
- 01843221259
- Email:
- office@nlfchurch.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window