Financial history NET CHURCH

Charity number: 1054377
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £268.76k £238.43k £243.20k £272.75k £0
Total expenditure £244.44k £214.80k £268.24k £229.08k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £9.08k N/A N/A N/A