SUREWAY INTERNATIONAL CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1054401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The principal activities (aim) of the Charity are worship and the involvement of various ministries and ministers of religion, in propagating Christian tenets to both members and non-members of the Ministry, at various meetings.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £267,674
Total expenditure: £201,203

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Northamptonshire
  • Nottingham City
  • Walsall
  • Throughout London
  • Australia
  • China
  • Ghana
  • Haiti
  • India
  • Kenya
  • Malta
  • Nigeria
  • Philippines
  • Uganda

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 April 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charmaine Denise Dawkins-Alder Trustee 09 February 2024
SUREWAY INTERNATIONAL CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES
Received: On time
Rev Eric Ofori-Darko Trustee 28 October 2023
SUREWAY INTERNATIONAL CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES
Received: On time
DEBORAH R SOROYE Trustee 01 February 2016
None on record
ISAAC ADDAI FCCA FFA Trustee 01 February 2016
None on record
REV STEVE ARMAH Trustee
SUREWAY INTERNATIONAL CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £238.25k £243.52k £260.64k £263.33k £267.67k
Total expenditure £309.89k £224.45k £201.60k £213.55k £201.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £30.78k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 21 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 July 2024 266 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 23 July 2024 266 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 19 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Sureway Int. Christian Ministries
2 Herne Hill Road
London
SE24 0AU
Phone:
02077336315
Website:

surewayministries.com