THE ROTHERHAM HOSPITAL AND COMMUNITY CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For any charitable purpose or purposes relating to the National Health Service wholly or mainly for the services provided within the Rotherham Health Community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Rotherham
Governance
- ROTHERHAM HEALTH COMMUNITY GENERAL CHARITY (Previous name)
- ROTHERHAM HEALTH COMMUNITY GENERAL CHARITY AND RELATED CHARITIES (Previous name)
- ROTHERHAM HEALTH FOUNDATION AND RELATED CHARITIES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE ROTHERHAM NHS FOUNDATION TRUST | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.00k | £511.00k | £79.00k | £238.00k | £353.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £183.00k | £425.00k | £47.00k | £210.00k | £251.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £506.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £28.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £385.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £40.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £8.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £2.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS
Charitable objects
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- ANAESTHETICS AND THEATRES CLINICAL DIRECTORATE GENERAL CHARITY
- BEECHCROFT CHARITY
- CHILD HEALTH CLINICAL DIRECTORATE GENERAL CHARITY
- CLINICAL RADIOLOGY AND MEDICAL PHYSICS CLINICAL DIRECTORATE GENERAL CHARITY
- COMMUNITY CHARITY
- DONCASTER GATE CHARITY
- GASTROENTEROLOGY RESEARCH GENERAL CHARITY
- GENERAL MEDICINE CLINICAL DIRECTORATE GENERAL CHARITY
- GENERAL OUTPATIENTS DEPARTMENT GENERAL CHARITY
- GENERAL SURGERY CLINICAL DIRECTORATE GENERAL CHARITY
- HAEMATOLOGY AND LEUKAEMIA TRUST FUND GENERAL CHARITY
- LABORATORY MEDICINE CLINICAL DIRECTORATE GENERAL CHARITY
- MEDICAL EDUCATION GENERAL CHARITY
- MEDICINE FOR THE ELDERLY CLINICAL DIRECTORATE GENERAL CHARITY
- OBSTETRICS AND GYNAECOLOGY CLINICAL DIRECTORATE GENERAL CHARITY
- OCCUPATIONAL THERAPY DEPARTMENT GENERAL CHARITY
- ORTHOPAEDICS AND ACCIDENT AND EMERGENCY CLINICAL DIRECTORATE GENERAL CHARITY
- PARK REHABILITATION CENTRE GENERAL CHARITY
- PHARMACY DEPARTMENT GENERAL CHARITY
- PHYSIOTHERAPY DEPARTMENT GENERAL CHARITY
- ROTHERHAM HEALTH FOUNDATION
- ROTHERHAM HOSPITAL CHARITY
- ROTHERHAM PRIORITY HEALTH CHATHAM HOUSE CHARITY
- ROTHERHAM PRIORITY HEALTH DOWNS CHILDREN CHARITY
- ROTHERHAM PRIORITY HEALTH MATBY CHARITY
- ROTHERHAM PRIORITY HEALTH MENTAL HEALTH CHARITY
- ROTHERHAM PRIORITY HEALTH SWALLOWNEST CHARITY
- ROTHERHAM PRIORITY HEALTH WATHWOOD CHARITY
- SPECIALIST MEDICINE CLINICAL DIRECTORATE GENERAL CHARITY
- SPECIALIST SURGERY CLINICAL DIRECTORATE GENERAL CHARITY
- THE ROTHERHAM 5000 CLUB STAFF LOTTERY CHARITY
- THE ROTHERHAM NHS FOUNDATION TRUST (EXPENDABLE FUNDS) COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
- 23 February 2005 : Standard registration
- 28 January 2009 : Removed
- 28 January 2009 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
Management Corridor
Level D
The Rotherham NHS Foundation Trust
Moorgate Road
Rotherham
- Phone:
- 01709427747
- Email:
- lisa.reid9@nhs.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window