ETERNITY CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church Services, Life Skills classes, Bible Studies, Christian Assemblies in local schools, Parent/Toddler group, Students Group, Children's Groups, Pastoring/social hubs, Food collection for local Foodbank. We also offer spiritual and emotional counselling for individuals. All of our activities are undergirded by our foundation of faith in Jesus Christ and the principles of Christianity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 09 April 1996: Standard registration
- EARLHAM (NORWICH) CHRISTIAN CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Davis Nwaka | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Davidson Sathish Kirubakaran Devadoss | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Kpodo | Trustee | 11 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alfred Kpodo | Trustee | 11 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jennike Venner | Trustee | 02 July 2004 |
|
|
||||
REV PATRICK ANDREW VENNER | Trustee | 01 July 2004 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.16k | £127.53k | £93.63k | £109.31k | £129.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.15k | £111.59k | £105.73k | £113.30k | £115.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 February 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 20 February 2023 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION WITH TRUST DEED ADOPTED 29TH SEPTEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 19 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE EARLHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Eternity Church
171 Earlham Green Lane
NORWICH
NR5 8RF
- Phone:
- 01603570420
- Email:
- norwich@weareeternity.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window