WELLINGBOROUGH CHRISTIAN CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MUMS & TOTS GROUPS NURSERY CHILDRENS CLUBS YOUTH CLUBS GARDENING CLUB IN-TOUCH GROUPS FAMILY GROUP PARENTS GROUP
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 09 April 1996: Standard registration
- 24 September 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 24 September 2008: Funds transferred to 1119323 REACHOUT COMMUNITY CHURCH
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £384.43k | £379.04k | £425.42k | £435.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £333.55k | £358.34k | £377.19k | £407.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 18 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 16 January 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 02 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 10 January 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 22 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 22 December 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10TH OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FORTHCOMING OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE WELLINGBOROUGH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window