Beacon Church

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preschool nursery with full daycare. Parent and Toddler group. Various local community outreaches. General church activities including bible studies and Sunday school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £150,361 from 3 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
118 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Suffolk
Governance
- 09 April 1996: Standard registration
- Beacon Church (Working name)
- CHRISTIAN RESOURCE CENTRE (Previous name)
- CRC BURY ST EDMUNDS (Previous name)
- THE CHRISTIAN RESOURCE CENTRE PENTECOSTAL CHURCH (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Dixon | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Grayson Edward Jones | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|||||
PAUL SISSONS | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID STEVENSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £225.10k | £188.00k | £260.00k | £307.63k | £476.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £232.41k | £197.00k | £211.00k | £253.91k | £400.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £91.50k | £94.00k | £118.60k | £150.36k | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.75k | £1.50k | N/A | £5.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND TRUST DEED ADOPTED 1 DECEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 27 APRIL 2009 as amended on 23 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; (B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE BURY ST. EDMUNDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
OAKES ROAD
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
SUFFOLK
IP32 6PX
- Phone:
- 07879512269
- Email:
- info@beaconchurchuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window