Financial history THE MID KENT BREAST CANCER RESEARCH APPEAL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1054459
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £45.60k £46.06k £89.02k £63.70k £60.93k
Total expenditure £37.43k £76.50k £5.61k £157.19k £6.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0