Financial history FICPS (FRIENDS OF IRCHESTER COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL)

Charity number: 1054460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 13/09/2019 13/09/2020 13/09/2021 13/09/2022 13/09/2023
Total gross income £18.30k £10.50k £6.52k £8.14k £6.64k
Total expenditure £8.98k £9.42k £5.62k £12.57k £11.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A