ROBERTS LIARDON MINISTRIES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of the Christian religion in the UK and overseas Advancement of religious and other education Relief of the aged poor sick and disabled
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 April 1996: Standard registration
- R L M EUROPE ROBERTS LIARDON MINISTRIES (Working name)
- ROBERTS LIARDON MINISTRIES EUROPE (Working name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERTS LIARDON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Claudeth MAY Hitchman | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Priscilla Guthrie | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Stephen Robert Horwood | Trustee | 06 February 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.55k | £18.55k | £17.63k | £8.72k | £7.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.38k | £17.36k | £20.70k | £8.74k | £6.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2022 | 338 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED 23 JANUARY 1996
Charitable objects
(I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION EITHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR OVERSEAS. (II) THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF RELIGIOUS OR OTHER EDUCATION. (III) THE RELIEF OF THE AGED POOR SICK OR DISABLED
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Notting Hill Gate Suite 125
LONDON
W11 3JE
- Phone:
- 001 1 941 748 3883
- Email:
- info@robertsliardon.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window