TEMPLE OF SHALOM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is mainly religious, preaching the word of God to people, helping the physical, mental, spiritual and social well-being of individuals. The charity also offers financial help to individuals and organisations when possible and provides counselling to everyone in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Bolton
- Manchester City
- Salford City
Governance
- 11 April 1996: Standard registration
- TEMPLE OF SHALOM CHRISTIAN CHURCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV S S AGGREY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Abibatu Janet Lamboi | Trustee | 09 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev CHRISTIAN YEBOAH ABOAGYE | Trustee | 13 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
ISAAC OPOKU | Trustee | 13 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE TETTEH-AHINAKWAH | Trustee | 12 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
AUGUSTINA JAMES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HANNAH LAVELLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115.59k | £100.50k | £36.41k | £61.04k | £48.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.32k | £37.32k | £46.30k | £100.60k | £56.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 August 2024 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 04 September 2024 | 127 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 03 July 2023 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 03 July 2023 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 21 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6 MARCH 1996
Charitable objects
A.TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. B.TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY.
Area of benefit
MANCHESTER,U.K.AND WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Verona Drive
Newton Heath
Manchester
Manchester
Lanchashire
M40 2RL
- Phone:
- 07401983228
- Email:
- office@templeofshalom.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window