Financial history YSGOL MEITHRIN LLANSAWEL

Charity number: 1054480
Charity reporting is up to date (60 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.70k £42.87k £56.68k £73.91k £70.85k
Total expenditure £15.94k £40.12k £53.85k £68.39k £73.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k £12.47k £2.65k £1.80k £1.00k