ISLINGTON PARENTS OF CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Islington
Governance
- 10 April 1996: Standard registration
- 31 August 2005: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- I P C S E N (Working name)
- IPCSEN (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 20 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH JUNE 1995 AS AMENDED 15TH FEBRUARY 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS AS DEFINED IN THE EDUCATION ACT 1993 (SEN) IRRESPECTIVE OF RACE, GENDER OR CREED AND TO RELIEVE SUCH CHILDREN AND THE PARENTS AND CARERS OF SUCH CHILDREN WHO ARE IN NEED BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION, COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE LONDON BOROUGH OF ISLINGTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window