FRIENDS OF STAR CLUBS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Social club for disabled adults
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sutton
Governance
- 11 April 1996: Standard registration
- DAY BREAK CLUB (Working name)
- F O S T A R (Working name)
- STAR CLUB (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN VINCENT SKINNER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Susan Kathleen Johnson | Trustee | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH JAYNE BEDLOW | Trustee | 15 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
RUSSELL CLARK | Trustee | 15 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANN FRANCES MARY SELKIRK DRAKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.37k | £16 | £570 | £390 | £380 | |
|
Total expenditure | £820 | £683 | £822 | £725 | £683 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 22 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 18 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH MARCH 1996
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE IN PARTICULAR FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH A PHYSICAL DISABILITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE THE LONDON BOROUGH OF SUTTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
95 THE CHASE
WALLINGTON
SM6 8LZ
- Phone:
- 02086861847
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window