ELMBRIDGE COMMUNITY THEATRE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To facilitate the provision of modern performing arts and multi-use facilities within the Borough of Elmbridge
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 16 April 1996: Standard registration
- 19 July 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2 | £10 | £4 | £3 | £2 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 13 August 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 20 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 10 February 2009 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 5TH MARCH 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS BY FOSTERING, PROMOTING AND INCREASING THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF DRAMA AND IN THE CO-RELATED ARTS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE BOROUGH OF ELMBRIDGE AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window