Financial history THE OASIS PARTNERSHIP UK

Charity number: 1054524
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.30m £1.27m £1.54m £1.65m £1.73m
Total expenditure £1.29m £1.27m £1.56m £1.71m £1.79m
Income from government contracts £24.40k N/A £102.67k £52.52k £53.45k
Income from government grants N/A £59.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £27.08k £33.40k £29.04k £28.04k £38.18k
Income - Other trading activities £220.94k £142.70k £297.29k £296.38k £330.75k
Income - Charitable activities £1.05m £1.09m £1.21m £1.32m £1.36m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.37k £400 £179 £1.58k £5.32k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.29m £1.27m £1.53m £1.66m £1.79m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.65k £0 £31.80k £47.25k £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0