THE OASIS PARTNERSHIP UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A charity supporting individuals and communities throughout Buckinghamshire, making a difference by offering a range of services and opportunities aimed at improving people's lives. Projects include Employability, Skills, Media, Arts & Culture, with the Oasis Cafe, Aylesbury being our main hub, with a focus on the Opportunities Bucks Strategy. Funded by Trusts, Foundations, and contracts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,730,591
Donations and legacies | £38.18k | |
Charitable activities | £1.36m | |
Other trading activities | £330.75k | |
Investments | £5.32k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,788,440
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.79m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £53,450 from 1 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.79m |
People

37 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 11 April 1996: Standard registration
- ACT (Working name)
- ADDICTION COUNSELLING TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philippe Fahim Chaudhry | Chair | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Hill | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Be Kaler Pilgrim | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Baum | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma-May Louse Darlington | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Aifra Perveen | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
liz Barter | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
COLIN MCGREGOR-PATERSON | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.30m | £1.27m | £1.54m | £1.65m | £1.73m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.29m | £1.27m | £1.56m | £1.71m | £1.79m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £24.40k | N/A | £102.67k | £52.52k | £53.45k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £59.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £27.08k | £33.40k | £29.04k | £28.04k | £38.18k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £220.94k | £142.70k | £297.29k | £296.38k | £330.75k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.05m | £1.09m | £1.21m | £1.32m | £1.36m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.37k | £400 | £179 | £1.58k | £5.32k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.29m | £1.27m | £1.53m | £1.66m | £1.79m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.65k | £0 | £31.80k | £47.25k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £388.94k | £500.03k | £425.63k | £386.74k | £296.20k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £134.20k | £244.76k | £194.47k | £213.29k | £180.59k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 26 FEBRUARY 1996, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16 NOVEMBER 2004 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME 15 JANUARY 2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 MAR 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED IS; TO PROMOTE HEALTH AND WELL-BEING BY PROVIDING HIGH QUALITY SOCIAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL TREATMENT AND SUPPORT SERVICES FOR THOSE PERSONS WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED AND WHOSE LIVES ARE ADVERSELY AFFECTED BY EITHER DRUG AND ALCOHOL PROBLEMS, MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES, HOMELESSNESS, OFFENDING BEHAVIOUR, UNEMPLOYMENT, SOCIAL DEPRIVATION, ISOLATION AND LONELINESS. WORKING PRIMARILY WITHIN THE COUNTY OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE, IT WILL DO THIS BY: (1) PROMOTING THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND REDUCE RISK FOR DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE. BY PROVIDING ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT INTERVENTIONS FOR PERSONS IN NEED. (2) RELIEVING THE HARDSHIP OF THOSE IN NEED BY PROVIDING INNOVATIVE, FLEXIBLE, SERVICE USER LED SUPPORT SERVICES. (3) THE RELIEF OF SOCIAL DEPRIVATION, ISOLATION, LONELINESS AND HOMELESSNESS, PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT SERVICES TO REDUCE ITS IMPACT. (4) ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, VOLUNTEERING AND UNEMPLOYMENT SUPPORT, IMPROVING SKILLS TO REDUCE THE IMPACT OF POVERTY AND HARDSHIP ON INDIVIDUALS, FAMILIES AND COMMUNITIES. (5) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE IN SOCIETY. (6) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE AFFECTED BY SUBSTANCE MISUSE AND MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES. PROVIDING ADVICE AND TREATMENT TO SUFFERERS. TO ACT AS A REFERRAL SERVICE. TO OFFER A CONSULTANCY, TRAINING AND EDUCATION SERVICE TO OTHER AGENCIES OR PERSONS.
Area of benefit
BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
OASIS CAFE
100a Walton Street
Aylesbury
BUCKS
HP21 7QP
- Phone:
- 03006662747
- Email:
- info@oasispartnership.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window