Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST PHILIP'S SCHOOL ASSOCIATION SEFTON

Charity number: 1054552
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 25 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 23 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 07 August 2022 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required