BOX CLEVER THEATRE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
writer-led touring theatre company creating contemporary issue-based theatre with and for young people. Recently extended its touring capacity with new work for venue touring. Also creates contemporary adaptations of curriculum set texts and offers specific teacher-training projects. Also participates in National Education linked conferences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £20,839 from 3 government contract(s) and £80,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 16 April 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATE JENKINS | Chair |
|
||||||
Tara Ahmed | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tara Parashar | Trustee | 23 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Henry McCreath | Trustee | 23 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Cath Smith | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anna Marylka Gowlland | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jane Hiley Beacham | Trustee | 18 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD FOLEY | Trustee | 23 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDREA GILLIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK DAVIES | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN FORSTER BROWN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £268.71k | £305.01k | £313.43k | £351.05k | £428.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £317.20k | £263.44k | £335.93k | £340.06k | £460.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £22.72k | £68.70k | £77.03k | £49.00k | £20.84k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £146.35k | £16.00k | N/A | £80.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28TH FEBRUARY 1996 AS AMENDED 18 JULY 2005. as amended on 26 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE ART OF DRAMA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Blackfriars Art Centre
10-11 Spain Lane
BOSTON
Lincolnshire
PE21 6HP
- Phone:
- 0333 034 1014
- Email:
- admin@boxclevertheatre.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window