Accounts and annual returns PRESET CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1054571
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 02 December 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 04 December 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 06 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 11 October 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 05 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 26 October 2010 On Time