BLACKBURN 83 ROUND TABLE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Local branch of National Association of Round Tables of Great Britain and Ireland, supporting individuals, volunutary and charitable groups in and around the Blackburn area of Lancashire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 08 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Blackburn With Darwen
Governance
- 15 April 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Cowell | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dave Wright | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jason Oldham | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Jackson | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Donnelly | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Michael Gater | Trustee | 01 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Elton Ashworth | Trustee | 01 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dave Carter | Trustee | 01 March 2010 |
|
|
||||
GRAEME EDWARDSON | Trustee | 07 April 2009 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JAMES BRIDGE | Trustee | 01 September 2002 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 08/04/2021 | 08/04/2022 | 08/04/2023 | 08/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.81k | £2.17k | £15.22k | £10.91k | £13.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.64k | £5.14k | £10.59k | £5.28k | £17.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 08 April 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 April 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 April 2021 | 19 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 29 JANUARY 1996
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 BALMORAL ROAD
ACCRINGTON
BB5 6DB
- Phone:
- 01254238138
- Email:
- bridgey2000@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window