ST JOHN FISHER ASSOCIATION HEAVY WOOLLEN DISTRICT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity operates from Dewsbury, West Yorkshire. We make donations to allow able bodied and disabled young people to visit religious places. We also make donations to other charities and provide buildings and human resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- 16 April 1996: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phillip Smith | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Murphy | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Craven | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Rushton | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clare Kernan | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Wilkinson | Trustee | 27 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.74k | £10.55k | £13.76k | £9.57k | £7.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.27k | £10.41k | £5.76k | £5.32k | £3.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 320 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 320 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 OCTOBER 1995 AS AMENDED 12 MARCH 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
St John Fisher C V Academy
Oxford Road
Dewsbury
WF13 4LL
- Phone:
- 01924527000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window