THE RIFLES AND THE ROYAL GLOUCESTERSHIRE, BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE REGIMENTAL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the Army, the Regiment (The Rifles), the RGBW and its antecedent regiments often through grants. It also: seeks to advance the education of the public, wider regiment and cadets in matters of deeds, history and training; supports heritage and core county activities; commemorates and remembers the fallen; addresses distress; and, fosters regimental ethos.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bracknell Forest
- Bristol City
- Gloucestershire
- Isle Of Wight
- Reading
- Slough
- South Gloucestershire
- West Berkshire
- Wiltshire
- Wokingham
Governance
- 17 April 1996: Standard registration
- 30 June 2017: Funds received from 255781 ROCKE BEQUEST
- 24 July 2017: Funds received from 1054654 THE RIFLES AND THE ROYAL GLOUCESTERSHIRE, BERKSHIR...
- 24 July 2017: Funds received from 1054659 THE ROYAL GLOUCESTERSHIRE, BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE...
- 22 September 2022: Funds transferred to 1119061 THE RIFLES REGIMENTAL TRUST
- 22 September 2022: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- THE RIFLES AND THE ROYAL GLOUCESTERSHIRE, BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE REGIMENT OFFICERS' TRUST (Previous name)
- THE ROYAL GLOUCESTERSHIRE, BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE REGIMENT OFFICERS' TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £282.36k | £20.86k | £17.97k | £13.60k | £33 | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.08k | £44.06k | £46.62k | £321.10k | £39.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 28 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 30 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE (1) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN AND IN PARTICULAR THE REGIMENT. (2) TO COMMEMORATE AND REMEMBER THOSE MEMBERS, OR FORMER MEMBERS, OF THE REGIMENT AND THE FORMER REGIMENTS WHO HAVE LOST THEIR LIVES OR SUFFERED INJURY, OR PUT THEMSELVES AT RISK OF LOSS OF LIFE OR INJURY, IN SERVICE TO THE PUBLIC. (3) TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS WHO ARE SERVING OR WHO HAVE SERVED IN THE REGIMENT OR THE FORMER REGIMENTS, OR THE DEPENDENTS OR FAMILIES OF SUCH PERSONS, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. (4) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, INCLUDING MEMBERS OF THE REGIMENT AND THE FORMER REGIMENTS IN THE HISTORY, DEEDS, TRADITIONS AND ROLE OF THE REGIMENT AND THE FORMER REGIMENTS. (5) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF YOUNG PERSONS SERVING IN AFFILIATED CADET UNITS IN THE PRINCIPLES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND SERVICE TO THE COMMUNITY, AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH AFFILIATED CADET UNITS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window