Accounts and annual returns OPERATION FLORIAN

Charity Number: 1054657
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2012 18 February 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 18 February 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 20 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 20 October 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 19 May 2011 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 05 April 2011 64 days late