Financial history RELATE SHROPSHIRE, HEREFORDSHIRE AND NORTH STAFFS LTD

Charity Number: 1054670
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £643.30k £675.61k £821.82k £974.66k £896.57k
Total expenditure £614.54k £662.92k £823.46k £971.84k £971.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £95.70k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.63k
Income - Donations and legacies £5.99k £1.52k £20.79k £3.30k £2.72k
Income - Other trading activities £213.09k £277.65k £345.57k £432.88k £368.55k
Income - Charitable activities £424.19k £389.83k £448.28k £520.69k £507.71k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £35 £87 £333 £156 £68
Income - Other £0 £6.53k £6.85k £17.63k £17.52k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £387.74k £419.01k £503.08k £561.45k £579.60k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £53.76k £49.82k £9.11k £24.43k £26.52k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £1.51k £0