Accounts and annual returns HEART OF ENGLAND RADIO CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1054689
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 11 September 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 11 September 2009 223 days late
Annual return 31 December 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 03 April 2008 155 days late
Annual return 31 December 2005 31 July 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 31 October 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 10 August 2006 283 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 08 November 2005 8 days late