BEDFORDSHIRE GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1054718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To pursue the objectives of the Girlguiding UK within Bedfordshire, overseeing @870 volunteers and @3300 young members aged 4-18.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £39,638
Total expenditure: £59,188

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Bedford
  • Central Bedfordshire
  • Luton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 April 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BEDFORDSHIRE GUIDE ASSOCAITION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Amanda Barker Chair 07 March 2019
None on record
Susan Bartlett Trustee 08 February 2024
None on record
Amanda Briscoe Trustee 03 January 2024
None on record
Allison Simms Trustee 17 November 2023
None on record
Julia Chetwynd Trustee 17 November 2023
None on record
Zoe Swinburn Trustee 13 October 2023
None on record
Danielle Ellis Trustee 13 October 2023
None on record
Claire Westwood Trustee 08 February 2023
None on record
Carol Mayr Trustee 28 February 2022
None on record
Samantha Chisman Trustee 11 September 2020
None on record
Alison Wenham Trustee 08 February 2020
HENLOW WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Received: On time
Carolyn Hare Trustee 08 February 2020
None on record
Adrian Maynard Trustee 31 December 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW, BIGGLESWADE
Received: On time
Jean Weir Trustee 24 May 2017
None on record
Victoria Davy Trustee 21 March 2016
None on record
Caroline DICKMAN Trustee 03 March 2014
None on record
KAREN KEELING Trustee 22 July 2011
FLITWICK GUIDE AND BROWNIE UNITS
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £63.27k £75.89k £64.26k £43.95k £39.64k
Total expenditure £62.74k £24.93k £75.83k £68.67k £59.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 07 January 2024 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 18 February 2024 110 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 November 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 November 2021 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 December 2020 58 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
63 STATION ROAD
FLITWICK
BEDFORD
MK45 1JU
Phone:
07917160761